Constitution, U.S.

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1016Cannabis Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0001 / JR0003)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsRules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0004United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and ApportionmentDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0007
    (SJ0006)
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator FroshSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0006
    (HJ0007)
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.