Consumer Price Index

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0147Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index AdjustmentsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0174Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0573
    (SB0518)
Fair Elections ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0631
    (SB0357)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0774Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0993
    (SB0752)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0010Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0357
    (HB0631)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0518
    (HB0573)
Fair Elections ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Elections (G1)
SB0589
    (HB0483)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0752
    (HB0993)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.