Consumer Price Index

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0038State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - AlterationsDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0116Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0159Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index AdjustmentsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/2/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0595
    (SB0497)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActDelegate HayesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0724 / CH0724
    (SB0462)
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - FeesDelegate OaksEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724Health and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0821Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1026Maryland Transit Administration - Fares - Calculation and Public CommentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1192 / CH0735
    (SB0816)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1372
    (SB0940)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1409
    (SB0263)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park LandDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0146 / CH0052Harford County - State's Attorney - SalaryHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0263
    (HB1409)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0462
    (HB0724 / CH0724)
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - FeesSenator ConwayIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0497
    (HB0595)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0816
    (HB1192 / CH0735)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0940
    (HB1372)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip CreditSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0981Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - FeesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1043Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living AdjustmentSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.