Consumer Price Index

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0664
    (SB0543)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate HettlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0946 / CH0508Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon LapseDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0957Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1061
    (SB0775)
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living SalariesDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1183
    (SB1076)
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - DefinitionDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0235Labor and Employment - Minimum Wage - IndexingSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0368Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0543
    (HB0664)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0775
    (HB1061)
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living SalariesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1019Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1076
    (HB1183)
Health Insurance - Access to and Coverage of Specialty Drugs - DefinitionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.