Contests

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070
    (SB0151)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0211 / CH0398
    (SB0268 / CH0399)
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on ContestsDelegate RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1382 / CH0439
    (SB1121 / CH0440)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Judicial ProceedingsElections (G1)
SB0151
    (HB0070)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0268 / CH0399
    (HB0211 / CH0398)
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on ContestsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0517 / CH0614
    (HB0628 / CH0613)
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within DepartmentsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.