Continuing Education

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0253 / CH0623State Board of Nursing - Registered Nurses and Licensed Practical Nurses - Renewal of Licenses - Continuing Education UnitsDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0275 / CH0183Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military CultureDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0451 / CH0186
    (SB0375 / CH0185)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0458
    (SB0604)
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program CoverageDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
HB0482 / CH0515
    (SB0385 / CH0516)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0501Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness EducationDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0683 / CH0235
    (SB0436 / CH0234)
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - AlterationsDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0710 / CH0418Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness CertificationCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0775 / CH0221
    (SB0600 / CH0222)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0791
    (SB0868)
Overdose Response Program - Prescribing and Dispensing of Naloxone - Noncertificate HoldersDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0807
    (SB0611)
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous RevisionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0920 / CH0335Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training RequirementDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1222Maryland School Discipline Reform ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1486Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionDelegate SteinIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1600 / CH0784State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing EducationDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784Economic Matters
4/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0275Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village PermitSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0375 / CH0185
    (HB0451 / CH0186)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0385 / CH0516
    (HB0482 / CH0515)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0436 / CH0234
    (HB0683 / CH0235)
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - AlterationsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0600 / CH0222
    (HB0775 / CH0221)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0604
    (HB0458)
Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program CoverageSenator BatesIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
SB0611
    (HB0807)
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous RevisionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0868
    (HB0791)
Overdose Response Program - Prescribing and Dispensing of Naloxone - Noncertificate HoldersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1030State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness CourseSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.