Continuing Education

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0075State Board of Cosmetologists - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Training RequirementsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0281 / CH0358Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)Delegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0742 / CH0756
    (SB0552 / CH0757)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 756Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0798 / CH0311Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Delegate KittlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0966
    (SB1103)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1071Courts - Business and Technology CourtDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1072 / CH0031Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Instruction and TrainingDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1096 / CH0786State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 786Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1226
    (SB0517)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1296Health Occupations – Practice of Optometry – Therapeutically Certified OptometristsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1452 / CH0213
    (SB1223 / CH0214)
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing EducationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1453
    (SB0732)
Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018Delegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1598 / CH0797Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display RequirementsDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 797Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1599
    (SB0949)
Career Education Policy ActDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1657Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - EstablishedDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0517
    (HB1226)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0552 / CH0757
    (HB0742 / CH0756)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0570 / CH0312Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Senator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0732
    (HB1453)
Renewable Energy and Job DevelopmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0949
    (HB1599)
Career Education Policy ActSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1103
    (HB0966)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1223 / CH0214
    (HB1452 / CH0213)
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing EducationSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.