Conventions

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0525
    (SB0516 / CH0283)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0129 / CH0182Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-CC (Corporate Club/Conference Center) LicenseSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0516 / CH0283
    (HB0525)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SJ0002U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt IncreasesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.