Correctional Institutions

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0254 / CH0092Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before ReleaseAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0424
    (SB0786)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0651
    (SB0478)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltyDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0848
    (SB0454)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1082 / CH0400Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses and Class B-AE Licenses PG 317-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1350Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry ProgramsDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1456Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance or Transfer of Class A Licenses Near Correctional Facilities PG 321-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0081 / CH0020Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - MembershipChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0454
    (HB0848)
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0478
    (HB0651)
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - PenaltySenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0491
    (HB0544)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0778
    (HB1138)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0786
    (HB0424)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0876
    (HB1494 / CH0688)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.