Correctional Institutions

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0582
    (SB0473 / CH0211)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - AllowancesDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0757Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree MurderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1092 / CH0297
    (SB0999)
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1126Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1180 / CH0597
    (SB0946 / CH0596)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1195Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional EducationDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1292State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration StatusDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1298Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration StatusDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1305Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1601Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate ClusterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0473 / CH0211
    (HB0582)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - AllowancesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0590Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - RestrictionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0783Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)Senator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0946 / CH0596
    (HB1180 / CH0597)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0999
    (HB1092 / CH0297)
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.