Correctional Institutions

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0459Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and EducationDelegate QueenIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
HB0565 / CH0121
    (SB0372 / CH0122)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1229
    (SB1105)
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - ProximityDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1233
    (SB0984)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1255
    (SB0981)
Juveniles - Mechanical RestraintsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1329
    (SB0967)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1342Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0372 / CH0122
    (HB0565 / CH0121)
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph TestingCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0830Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security NotificationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0967
    (HB1329)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0984
    (HB1233)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1105
    (HB1229)
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - ProximitySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:39 P.M.