Correctional Officers

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0013Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional OfficersDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0232 / CH0412
    (SB0605 / CH0411)
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 412Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0314 / CH0551
    (SB0346 / CH0550)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0359Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneyDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0419
    (SB0822)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0582
    (SB0473 / CH0211)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - AllowancesDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0768Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License Training Requirement - ExceptionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0855 / CH0555
    (SB0439 / CH0554)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0906
    (SB0433)
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill InmatesDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1038Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1092 / CH0297
    (SB0999)
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1153Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1207Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Correctional OfficerDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1438 / CH0219
    (SB0532 / CH0218)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management SpecialistDelegate SophocleusApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1484
    (SB0015)
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting RequirementsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1545
    (SB1031)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - DROPDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1556
    (SB1128 / CH0712)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
RulesCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0015
    (HB1484)
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting RequirementsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0044Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0346 / CH0550
    (HB0314 / CH0551)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0433
    (HB0906)
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill InmatesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0439 / CH0554
    (HB0855 / CH0555)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0473 / CH0211
    (HB0582)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - AllowancesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0532 / CH0218
    (HB1438 / CH0219)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management SpecialistSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
AppropriationsState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0605 / CH0411
    (HB0232 / CH0412)
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0822
    (HB0419)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management ServicesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0875State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits StudySenator SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0999
    (HB1092 / CH0297)
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1031
    (HB1545)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - DROPSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1128 / CH0712
    (HB1556)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingSenator YoungEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.