Counselors

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0014Criminal Law - Part-Time School Employees, Contractors, and Coaches - Sexual Contact with MinorsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0031
    (SB0377)
Criminal Law - Fourth-Degree Sex Offense - School Employees and ContractorsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0056 / CH0348State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records ChecksDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0060Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0246Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video ConferencingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0394Education - Primary and Secondary Schools - Electronic Control DevicesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0581 / CH0379Hospitals - Establishment of Palliative Care Pilot ProgramsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0601Education - Loan Assistance - Professional Counselors and Alcohol and Drug CounselorsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0805Health Occupations - Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Denial of ApplicationsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0957 / CH0657Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with DisabilitiesDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1290
    (SB0837)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1424
    (SB1012)
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Program - RequirementsDelegate SmigielIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0105Criminal Law - Sexual Contact with Minors - School EmployeesSenator BrochinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0214Criminal Law - Part-Time School Employees and Coaches - Sexual Contact with MinorsSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0377
    (HB0031)
Criminal Law - Fourth-Degree Sex Offense - School Employees and ContractorsSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0382Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of FirearmsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0678Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0810Coaches - Sexual Contact with Minors - ProhibitionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0837
    (HB1290)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1012
    (HB1424)
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Program - RequirementsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.