Counselors

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0468
    (SB0097 / CH0348)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0579
    (SB0858)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0583
    (SB0283 / CH0546)
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of DogfightingDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0746Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0885Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0908Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0921Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training RequirementDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0944Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1100School Counseling Program - Counseling Services - RequirementsDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1103Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1212Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1403 / CH0033
    (SB1170)
Next Generation Scholars of MarylandDelegate McIntoshEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1437Education - Individualized Counseling Services - RequirementsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1467Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare ProgramDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0097 / CH0348
    (HB0468)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0283 / CH0546
    (HB0583)
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of DogfightingSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0858
    (HB0579)
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and YouthSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1170
    (HB1403 / CH0033)
Next Generation Scholars of MarylandSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.