Counselors

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0277
    (SB0223)
Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration RequirementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0298 / CH0219Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - ReimbursementDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0352
    (SB1106 / CH0610)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapyDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0425 / CH0844
    (SB0651 / CH0843)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0515Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0786 / CH0583Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - EstablishmentDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Ways and Means
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0869 / CH0580
    (SB0553)
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection ActDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0981
    (SB0664 / CH0690)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipAllegany County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0983 / CH0765Health Insurance - Health Care Services Delivered Through Telehealth - CoverageDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 765Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1060State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure IssuanceDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1197
    (SB0797)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1214
    (SB1013)
Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - LicensureDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1458State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists ActDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1497Video Lottery Operations - Persons on Voluntary Exclusion List - TrespassDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1596
    (SB0121)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Roberta's HouseDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1652Health Occupations - Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - QualificationsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0121
    (HB1596)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Roberta's HouseSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0223
    (HB0277)
Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0553
    (HB0869 / CH0580)
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection ActSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0651 / CH0843
    (HB0425 / CH0844)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0664 / CH0690
    (HB0981)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0797
    (HB1197)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1013
    (HB1214)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental TherapySenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1106 / CH0610
    (HB0352)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.