Counselors

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0032
    (SB0015)
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - QualificationsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0248Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - QualificationsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0569Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician AssistantDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0689 / CH0474
    (SB0509)
Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center ActDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0742 / CH0756
    (SB0552 / CH0757)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 756Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0787 / CH0827
    (SB0629 / CH0828)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0902
    (SB1028 / CH0685)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Delegate CullisonIn the House - Favorable Report AdoptedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0992Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - DefinitionsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1096 / CH0786State Government - Veteran Employment and Transition Success ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 786Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1111
    (SB0969)
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending MachinesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1359Criminal Procedure - Mental Health and Substance Abuse Offender Reentry Support ProgramDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1720Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and PoliciesDelegate PattersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1832Education - Public Schools - Threat Assessment ReportDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0015
    (HB0032)
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - QualificationsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0509
    (HB0689 / CH0474)
Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - EstablishedSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0552 / CH0757
    (HB0742 / CH0756)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0969
    (HB1111)
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending MachinesSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
SB1028 / CH0685
    (HB0902)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.