Country Clubs

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0269
    (SB0459 / CH0504)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1248Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator ProgramsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0459 / CH0504
    (HB0269)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) LicenseMontgomery County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0552 / CH0522Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages LicensesSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.