County Administrators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0309 / CH0070Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - RegulationAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0968 / CH0397
    (SB0092 / CH0398)
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018Delegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1742Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County ApprovalDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0092 / CH0398
    (HB0968 / CH0397)
Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot ProgramSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0924 / CH0234
    (HB1217 / CH0235)
Local Government – Splash Pads – RegulationsSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:12 P.M.