County Commissioners

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0196 / CH0198
    (SB0171 / CH0197)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0305 / CH0469
    (SB0429 / CH0468)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0310
    (SB0430)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0402
    (SB0320)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0414 / CH0228
    (SB0315 / CH0227)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0423St. Mary's County - Building Impact FeesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0465
    (SB0424 / CH0263)
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and EnforcementDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0466
    (SB0155 / CH0195)
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor DockDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0470Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0520St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0555 / CH0378St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - DeferralsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0720 / CH0558
    (SB0814 / CH0557)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1362
    (SB0927)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1507 / CH0690St. Mary's County - Property MaintenanceSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 690Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1511
    (SB1042)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0154 / CH0194Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0155 / CH0195
    (HB0466)
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor DockSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0171 / CH0197
    (HB0196 / CH0198)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by MailSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0315 / CH0227
    (HB0414 / CH0228)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0320
    (HB0402)
Frederick County - Authority to Ban Synthetic CannabinoidsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0424 / CH0263
    (HB0465)
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and EnforcementSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0429 / CH0468
    (HB0305 / CH0469)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0430
    (HB0310)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0546Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0729 / CH0310Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of ElectionCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0814 / CH0557
    (HB0720 / CH0558)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0927
    (HB1362)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1042
    (HB1511)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.