County Commissioners

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0135 / CH0491Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax RatesCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0255Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable AdultsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0280Carroll County - Gaming EventsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0599 / CH0439
    (SB0839)
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - PenaltiesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0616
    (SB0838 / CH0386)
St. Mary's County - Animal RegulationsSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0652 / CH0446Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0973Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0993
    (SB0752)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1170
    (SB0637 / CH0188)
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual ReportsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1171
    (SB0923)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0004 / CH0142Carroll County - Gaming EventsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Budget and Taxation
1/15/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0333Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" CondemnationSenator MillerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0360 / CH0162Calvert County - Budget Hearings and ProceduresCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0637 / CH0188
    (HB1170)
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual ReportsWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 188Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0752
    (HB0993)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0838 / CH0386
    (HB0616)
St. Mary's County - Animal RegulationsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0839
    (HB0599 / CH0439)
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - PenaltiesSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0923
    (HB1171)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransWashington County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0938Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent CountySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.