County Commissioners

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0149 / CH0168
    (SB0135 / CH0167)
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense ReimbursementsDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0352 / CH0261Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System AuditsDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0360 / CH0719
    (SB0073)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0790 / CH0363
    (SB0227 / CH0362)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransDelegate WivellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0867
    (SB0517 / CH0217)
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - ProcessWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0868 / CH0071
    (SB0516 / CH0070)
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local AuthorityDelegate McKayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0884 / CH0283
    (SB1001)
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local ProvisionsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0972
    (SB0995 / CH0236)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1028 / CH0227
    (SB0682 / CH0226)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1147 / CH0301Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and ReferendumCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1344 / CH0509Queen Anne's County - County Commissioners Election Method - Straw BallotDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0135 / CH0167
    (HB0149 / CH0168)
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense ReimbursementsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0227 / CH0362
    (HB0790 / CH0363)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled VeteransWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0307 / CH0182Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0516 / CH0070
    (HB0868 / CH0071)
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local AuthorityWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0517 / CH0217
    (HB0867)
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - ProcessWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0682 / CH0226
    (HB1028 / CH0227)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0995 / CH0236
    (HB0972)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1001
    (HB0884 / CH0283)
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local ProvisionsSenator WaughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.