County Commissioners

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0110 / CH0741St. Mary's County - Inmate Release ProgramsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 741Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0225 / CH0807
    (SB0173 / CH0808)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationDelegate JacobsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0331 / CH0109St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0498 / CH0112Calvert County - Salary of Assistant SheriffCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0609 / CH0089
    (SB0360)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0725Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing ThresholdCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0729 / CH0114Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted BudgetCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0815 / CH0744Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and BiddingCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0984 / CH0268
    (SB0542 / CH0269)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1315Carroll County - County Commissioners - Allowance and BenefitsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1321 / CH0099
    (SB0889)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsDelegate CordermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1357 / CH0841Calvert County - County Officials - SalariesCalvert County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1459 / CH0118Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1484Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo LicenseCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1580Calvert County - Competitive Bidding ProcessDelegate FisherIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1757
    (SB1124)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0173 / CH0808
    (HB0225 / CH0807)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationSenator HersheyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0360
    (HB0609 / CH0089)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0540 / CH0699Garrett County - Bids and ContractsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 699Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0542 / CH0269
    (HB0984 / CH0268)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0889
    (HB1321 / CH0099)
Washington County – Public Facilities BondsWashington County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0961 / CH0420Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1124
    (HB1757)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.