County Councils

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0113
    (SB0173)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0196 / CH0198
    (SB0171 / CH0197)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0454Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0633Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Supplementary Salary MC/PG 106-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0636 / CH0124Washington Suburban Sanitary District - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 103-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0637 / CH0626Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1107 / CH0147Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1285Prince George's County - Public School Construction Fee and Fund - Authority to Establish and Administer PG 402-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1432 / CH0684Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1443Anne Arundel County - County Council Special Elections - Voting by MailDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1454Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1470Anne Arundel County - County Council and County Executive Special Elections - Voting by MailDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0108Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0171 / CH0197
    (HB0196 / CH0198)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by MailSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0546Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1071Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness InitiativePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.