Court of Appeals

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0139 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal RightsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0367Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0385
    (SB0252)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1375 / CH0486
    (SB0781 / CH0485)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CDelegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0252
    (HB0385)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0500 / CH0544Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney RepresentationSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0781 / CH0485
    (HB1375 / CH0486)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1187Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing ProceedingSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.