Court of Appeals

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0537Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0949Attorney Grievance Commission - MembershipDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1071Courts - Business and Technology CourtDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1081
    (SB1050)
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – ProceduresDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1246
    (SB0954)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1411
    (SB0346)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1585
    (SB0511)
Civil Actions - Active Duty Service Members - Electronic Deposition and TestimonyDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1619Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole ProprietorshipsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0346
    (HB1411)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0511
    (HB1585)
Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and TestimonySenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0954
    (HB1246)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertySenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1050
    (HB1081)
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - ProceduresSenator SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.