Court Costs

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0053 / CH0584Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - RequiredDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0108
    (SB0032)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0201District Court Electronic Citation Fund and FeeDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0275
    (SB0481 / CH0173)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 YearsDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0430Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithDelegate CardinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0724
    (SB0435)
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - StandingDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0803
    (SB1005)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court CostsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0867Maryland False Claims ActDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0971Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for ReliefDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1273
    (SB0986)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1314Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against RetaliationDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1529
    (SB1095)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0032
    (HB0108)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0286Animals - Civil Liability and Insurance Coverage for Dogs and Court Costs for Animal-Related CrimesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0326Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0435
    (HB0724)
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - StandingSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0481 / CH0173
    (HB0275)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 YearsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0585 / CH0307Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0682Courts - Animal-Related Crimes - Court CostsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1005
    (HB0803)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court CostsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1095
    (HB1529)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.