Court Costs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024 / CH0758Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Public Safety (E4)
HB0264Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0456
    (SB0376)
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and RansomwareDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0685Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to AppearDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0956Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly AdultDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1270
    (SB1042)
Access to Maryland Courts ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1383
    (SB1212)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1403Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – PenaltiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0376
    (HB0456)
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and RansomwareSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1042
    (HB1270)
Access to Maryland Courts ActSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1212
    (HB1383)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.