Court of Special Appeals

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0250 / CH0363Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of RestitutionDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1287Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time RequirementsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0268Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public InformationSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.