Credit

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0123Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Credit Card Debt ForgivenessDelegate SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0187Consumer Protection - Health Clubs - Surety Bond RequirementsDelegate Miller, W.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0458Personal and Business Documents - EvidenceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0538Video Lottery Facility - Credit Extensions to Patrons - LimitationDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeDelegate Washington, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0859 / CH0646Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property TrustsDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0878Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required NoticeDelegate Turner, V.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1166
    (SB0777 / CH0321)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1167Consumer Protection - Credit Cards - Surcharge on Sales Transactions - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1195Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on RentalsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1218Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of SurchargeDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1339Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of PaymentDelegate MinnickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1492
    (SB0387)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB1519
    (SB0735)
Insurance - Premium FinancingDelegate DonoghueIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0375 / CH0247
    (HB0785)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0387
    (HB1492)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0735
    (HB1519)
Insurance - Premium FinancingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0777 / CH0321
    (HB1166)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1043Commercial Law - Acceleration of Loan Indebtedness Due to Death - ProhibitedSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.