Credit

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0036Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0187
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0351
    (SB0301)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0656
    (SB0945)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Occupation or Education LevelDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0657
    (SB1059)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0664
    (SB0543)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate HettlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0674
    (SB1198)
Business Regulation - Home Improvement ContractsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0710
    (SB0202)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and FeesDelegate CareyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0755Campaign Finance - Illegal Contributions - Fair Campaign Financing FundDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0916Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - DepositsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0940
    (SB0479)
High School Credit for College Courses Act of 2018Delegate PattersonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1216
    (SB0978)
Career Preparation Expansion ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)
HB1234
    (SB0618)
Career Youth Apprenticeship and Apprenticeship in State Employment Opportunity ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1297Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1594
    (SB1104)
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I EligibilityDelegate CareyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1647Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1670
    (SB0072)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating PoliciesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0006
    (HB0187)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0072
    (HB1670)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating PoliciesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.Finance
1/23/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0202
    (HB0710)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and FeesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0205High School Credit Clarification Act of 2018Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0301
    (HB0351)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0479
    (HB0940)
High School Credit for College Courses Act of 2018Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0510Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0543
    (HB0664)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0603Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standards - SourcesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0618
    (HB1234)
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0620Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Former Baltimore City Jail EmployeesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0755Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities AssessmentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0945
    (HB0656)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education LevelSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0978
    (HB1216)
Career Preparation Expansion ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
SB1059
    (HB0657)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1104
    (HB1594)
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I EligibilitySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1198
    (HB0674)
Business Regulation - Home Improvement ContractsSenator BatesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

February 22, 2018 5:45 A.M.