Cremation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1042
    (SB0648 / CH0322)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1236
    (SB0580)
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and PenaltiesDelegate ParrottIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB1239
    (SB0775)
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit RequirementsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0580
    (HB1236)
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and PenaltiesSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0648 / CH0322
    (HB1042)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0775
    (HB1239)
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.