Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0338
    (SB0173)
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and ReportingDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0339
    (SB0413 / CH0127)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsDelegate CarterVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0360
    (SB0528)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0388
    (SB0602 / CH0042)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0397Commercial Bail Data AnalysisDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0456 / CH0091
    (SB0521)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0596Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program CorporationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0780Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate McComasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0855Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0896 / CH0464
    (SB0607)
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use DisordersDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0954 / CH0134Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0971Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership FundDelegate OaksVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0173
    (HB0338)
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and ReportingSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0413 / CH0127
    (HB0339)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0521
    (HB0456 / CH0091)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human TraffickingSenator LeeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0528
    (HB0360)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0602 / CH0042
    (HB0388)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0607
    (HB0896 / CH0464)
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use DisordersSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0641 / CH0045Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership FundSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.