Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0110
    (SB0745)
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0336 / CH0619
    (SB0161 / CH0658)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0390
    (SB0425 / CH0387)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - StatewideDelegate ReillyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0521
    (SB0589)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsDelegate SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0585Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Policies and Reporting RequirementsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0786 / CH0081
    (SB0863 / CH0080)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset ExtensionDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1089
    (SB0865)
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - FineDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1180 / CH0597
    (SB0946 / CH0596)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1273Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1306Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle ForfeitureDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1490
    (SB0864 / CH0516)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0083 / CH0529Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement FundChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0161 / CH0658
    (HB0336 / CH0619)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator HoughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0425 / CH0387
    (HB0390)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - StatewideSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0589
    (HB0521)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0745
    (HB0110)
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0768Justice Reinvestment Oversight BoardSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Safety (E4)
SB0863 / CH0080
    (HB0786 / CH0081)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset ExtensionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0864 / CH0516
    (HB1490)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Senator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0865
    (HB1089)
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - FineSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0946 / CH0596
    (HB1180 / CH0597)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.