Criminal Background Investigations

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0056 / CH0348State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records ChecksDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0057 / CH0606
    (SB0355 / CH0239)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0060Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate SmigielIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0247 / CH0091Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - AdministrationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0294
    (SB0281 / CH0427)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0375
    (SB0266)
Regulated Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's License - Record Keeping and Reporting RequirementsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0442 / CH0052
    (SB0415 / CH0051)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0443 / CH0050
    (SB0413 / CH0049)
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care ProvidersDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0474
    (SB0611)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0624 / CH0282
    (SB0501 / CH0281)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0712Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General AuthorityDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0806 / CH0391Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0809Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from DisqualificationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1006Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19) Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1083Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 312-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1291
    (SB0554)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1300
    (SB0646)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Check - Armored Car Company EmployeesDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1408 / CH0417Family Law - Criminal History Records Checks - Student TeachersDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0004 / CH0160State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records ChecksSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0266
    (HB0375)
Regulated Firearms - Database - Applications for Dealer's License - Record Keeping and Reporting RequirementsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0355 / CH0239
    (HB0057 / CH0606)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0372Health Occupation Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General AuthoritySenator RobeyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0413 / CH0049
    (HB0443 / CH0050)
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care ProvidersSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0415 / CH0051
    (HB0442 / CH0052)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0501 / CH0281
    (HB0624 / CH0282)
State Board of Nursing - Licensure by Endorsement - Clinical ExperienceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0554
    (HB1291)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0611
    (HB0474)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0646
    (HB1300)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Check - Armored Car Company EmployeesSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.