Criminal Background Investigations

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0393
    (SB0105)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives ActDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0013Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) CheckDelegate SchulzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0090
    (SB0426 / CH0171)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Requirements MC 17-15Montgomery County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0189 / CH0404
    (SB0261)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0244 / CH0313
    (SB0526)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Delegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 313Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0256
    (SB0397)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - EmployeesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0386 / CH0245Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential DatabaseDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0490 / CH0251Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous RevisionsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0574
    (SB0449 / CH0034)
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure RequirementsDelegate Robinson, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0742
    (SB0201 / CH0331)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsDelegate HayesIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0904Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle ProsequiDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0908
    (SB0617)
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Delegate GhristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1110 / CH0298Law Enforcement - Special Police OfficersChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1231
    (SB0868 / CH0204)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network ServicesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 a.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1237 / CH0305Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records ChecksChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0105
    (HB0009 / CH0393)
Maryland Home Birth Safety ActSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0201 / CH0331
    (HB0742)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0252Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0261
    (HB0189 / CH0404)
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0391 / CH0167State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records ChecksSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0397
    (HB0256)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - EmployeesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0426 / CH0171
    (HB0090)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License RequirementsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0449 / CH0034
    (HB0574)
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure RequirementsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0526
    (HB0244 / CH0313)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0617
    (HB0908)
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)Senator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0868 / CH0204
    (HB1231)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire TransportationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0912Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.