Criminal Background Investigations

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0359 / CH0149
    (SB0309)
Health - Reporting of Overdose InformationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0490
    (SB0163 / CH0441)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0541Labor and Employment – Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1534
    (SB1153)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1571Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1597 / CH0796Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – ReportsDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 796Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1642
    (SB1012)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – OmbudsmanDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0008 / CH0656State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0062 / CH0658Maryland Chiropractic Act - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0107Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting RequirementsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0111 / CH0663Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax InformationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0163 / CH0441
    (HB0490)
Public Health – Community Health Workers – Advisory Committee and CertificationSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0309
    (HB0359 / CH0149)
Health - Reporting of Overdose InformationPresidentIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedFinance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0908Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1012
    (HB1642)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of ServicersSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1153
    (HB1534)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1262Public Safety - Background Information for Firearm License Investigations - School Crisis Welfare Officers (School Safety Act 2018: Prevention)Senator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.