Criminal Injuries Compensation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0382Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court CostsDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0626Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court CostsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.