Curriculum

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0174Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental ConsentDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0365Montgomery County - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Affirmative Consent MC 14-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1381 / CH0608
    (SB0866 / CH0609)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1461
    (SB0980)
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution FundDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1512
    (SB0942)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0710 / CH0727Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental ConsentSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 727Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0866 / CH0609
    (HB1381 / CH0608)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0908 / CH0849Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedSenator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0942
    (HB1512)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.