Curriculum

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0203 / CH0375
    (SB0586)
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and LicensureDelegate HornbergerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0251 / CH0736
    (SB0402 / CH0737)
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and ConsentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 736Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0281 / CH0358Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)Delegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0350
    (SB0300)
Achieving Computer Science Collaborations for Employing Students Statewide (ACCESS) Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0351
    (SB0301)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1110 / CH0244Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital DevicesDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1234 / CH0403
    (SB0618)
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship ActDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1375Driver Education Curriculum - Rights of Drivers Involved in Traffic StopsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1415 / CH0361
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1462
    (SB0701)
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human TraffickingDelegate EbersoleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1607 / CH0565Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and OperationDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1816
    (SB1257)
Safe Schools Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0236State Board of Education - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and ImplementationSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0237Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0300
    (HB0350)
Achieving Computer Science Collaborations for Employing Students Statewide (ACCESS) Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0301
    (HB0351)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0402 / CH0737
    (HB0251 / CH0736)
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and ConsentSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 737Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0470 / CH0376Higher Education – Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships – Reimbursement of Expenses for Community College Certification and LicensureSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0508Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum ContentSenator WaughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0701
    (HB1462)
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human TraffickingSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1257
    (HB1816)
Safe Schools Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:37 A.M.