Deaf Persons

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1189
    (SB0097)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of MarylandDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0083 / CH0178Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access PointChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0097
    (HB1189)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Veditz Center of MarylandSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0969 / CH0594
    (HB1413 / CH0595)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.