Dealers

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042Public Safety - Firearms - Application Approval Before Sale, Rental, or TransferDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0060Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013Delegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0337 / CH0394Farm Breweries - Location and Self-DistributionDelegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0356 / CH0596Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival LicensesDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0713Public Safety - Handgun Safety Devices - External Safety LocksDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0715
    (SB0584)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0719Public Safety - Firearms - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0818Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) CheckDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0830
    (SB0287)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0880
    (SB0658)
Marijuana Control Act of 2014Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0995Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1196
    (SB0065)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1368
    (SB1083)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1538Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Locations for Transaction of BusinessDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0065
    (HB1196)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0287
    (HB0830)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0584
    (HB0715)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0658
    (HB0880)
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0728Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background ChecksSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0788Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station DealersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1083
    (HB1368)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1110Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Copper WireSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.