Dealers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042 / CH0314Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery LicensesDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0198 / CH0115Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required RecordCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0612Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0781 / CH0343Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement RevisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1114
    (SB0892)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1149
    (SB0951)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsDelegate KramerIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1338Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on DeliveryDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1448Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - TransactionsDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0619Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - MixtureSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0847Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required SignageSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0892
    (HB1114)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0922Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - ApplicantsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0948Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary TransactionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0951
    (HB1149)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:03 P.M.