Death

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0083 / CH0685Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan DebtDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0329Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)Delegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0370
    (SB0354)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0547Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0559
    (SB0051)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0584 / CH0771
    (SB0572)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActDelegate Young, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0612Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0687
    (SB0539 / CH0569)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in DeathSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0693
    (SB0642)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0725 / CH0545State Board of Dental Examiners - Death of a Licensed Dentist - Ownership of a Dental PracticeDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 545Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0726Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0735 / CH0626
    (SB0073 / CH0627)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving SpouseDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0767
    (SB0970)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0861 / CH0243Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of DefendantsDelegate Barnes, D.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0920 / CH0335Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training RequirementDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1064
    (SB0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1122 / CH0278
    (SB0913 / CH0277)
State Retirement and Pension System - Death BenefitsDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1165Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family RelationshipsDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1223Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and ExceptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1319Child Care Centers - Operating Without a License - PenaltiesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1342Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - ReportsDelegate Washington, A.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1376Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving SpouseDelegate MaloneIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0038 / CH0040Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and CouncilsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0051
    (HB0559)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0073 / CH0627
    (HB0735 / CH0626)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving SpouseSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0143 / CH0413Injury to or Death of Pet - DamagesSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0354
    (HB0370)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0478
    (HB1064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0539 / CH0569
    (HB0687)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substances - FentanylPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0572
    (HB0584 / CH0771)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActSenator SimonaireIn the House - House Refuses to RecedeFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0642
    (HB0693)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - RevisionsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0753 / CH0242Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Right of Redemption - Naming of DefendantsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0913 / CH0277
    (HB1122 / CH0278)
State Retirement and Pension System - Death BenefitsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1100Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - RepealSenator BrochinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.