Debt Management

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0136 / CH0187
    (SB0314 / CH0186)
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - CompositionDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0460
    (SB0381 / CH0146)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage LoansSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0783Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - RestrictionsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1014 / CH0690
    (SB0676 / CH0689)
College Affordability Act of 2016Delegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1451Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate VaughnIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HJ0001National Goal of Debt-Free Higher EducationDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0088 / CH0341Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special FundsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0314 / CH0186
    (HB0136 / CH0187)
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - CompositionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0381 / CH0146
    (HB0460)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage LoansPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0503Education - Online Instructional Program for Financial LiteracySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0676 / CH0689
    (HB1014 / CH0690)
College Affordability Act of 2016Senator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1132Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and FeeSenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesFinancial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.