Debt Management

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0262Student Debt Disclosure Act of 2017Delegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0441 / CH0594
    (SB0460)
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace PeriodDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0568Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a SetoffDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1033Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan DebtDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1055
    (SB0737 / CH0424)
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and RepaymentSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1155
    (SB0367 / CH0231)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt ReliefDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1576 / CH0311Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0367 / CH0231
    (HB1155)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt ReliefSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0460
    (HB0441 / CH0594)
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace PeriodSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0465 / CH0629
    (HB1517)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0737 / CH0424
    (HB1055)
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and RepaymentSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:30 A.M.