Deeds

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0522
    (SB0465)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0794 / CH0640
    (SB0696)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0946Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1021
    (SB0910)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0436 / CH0267
    (HB1209 / CH0268)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0465
    (HB0522)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0696
    (HB0794 / CH0640)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensSenator StoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0910
    (HB1021)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0994Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersTaxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.