Demographics

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise ScholarshipsDelegate TurnerIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
HB0292Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of InformationDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0462Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - ReportsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0941Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1415
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSpeakerIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1524
    (SB1134)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1530Education – Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury – Study and ReportDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1603
    (SB1109)
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and EthnicityDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1654Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net NeutralityDelegate FrickIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1819
    (SB0615)
Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – EstablishedDelegate JacksonIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
SB0978
    (HB1216)
Career Preparation Expansion ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)
SB1109
    (HB1603)
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and EthnicitySenator RamirezIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

April 16, 2018 4:02 P.M.