Dentists

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0047Environment - Mercury - Dental AmalgamDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0100 / CH0381Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0101 / CH0382Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0169Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming ProvisionsDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0301
    (SB0413 / CH0496)
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0303 / CH0593
    (SB0412)
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0657 / CH0416State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0693 / CH0610
    (SB0504)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0783
    (SB0717)
Task Force to Study School-Based Health CentersDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0792
    (SB0695)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0799
    (SB0703)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health MonthDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1254Environment - Dental Amalgam - Reduction in UseDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1404Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing EducationDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0412
    (HB0303 / CH0593)
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActSenator DysonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0413 / CH0496
    (HB0301)
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy ActSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0504
    (HB0693 / CH0610)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0695
    (HB0792)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - CoverageSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0703
    (HB0799)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Children's Dental Health MonthSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0717
    (HB0783)
Task Force to Study School-Based Health CentersSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.