Dentists

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0355
    (SB0431)
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and AccessDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0375 / CH0417
    (SB0403)
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0547Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0580 / CH0437
    (SB0198)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0716 / CH0269
    (SB0347)
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management ContractsDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0766
    (SB0421)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - ExemptionsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0858
    (SB0141)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0018State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0141
    (HB0858)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0198
    (HB0580 / CH0437)
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended CoursesSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0202State Board of Dental Examiners - Mental Health and Physical ExaminationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0205Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - PenaltiesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0347
    (HB0716 / CH0269)
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management ContractsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0403
    (HB0375 / CH0417)
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0421
    (HB0766)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - ExemptionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0431
    (HB0355)
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and AccessSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0556 / CH0363Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0887Health Occupations - Dentistry - Scope of Practice and Licensure ExceptionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.