Dentists

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Harford County - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0104 / CH0474Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying ProvidersDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Health and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0273
    (SB0720)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Frederick Memorial Hospital Dental ClinicDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0407
    (SB0791)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental ClinicDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0437 / CH0147
    (SB0537)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0470 / CH0106
    (SB0825)
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous OxideDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0511 / CH0058
    (SB0252 / CH0057)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0680 / CH0111
    (SB0460)
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local AnesthesiaDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0800Health Insurance - Payments to Noncontracting Specialists and Noncontracting Nonphysician SpecialistsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0830
    (SB0538)
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1247 / CH0305
    (SB0919)
Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health PlansDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1283
    (SB0228)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate OaksIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1318 / CH0309
    (SB0929)
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network DirectoriesDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1339
    (SB0717)
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration Fees and InspectionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1468State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate HayesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1608
    (SB0550)
Task Force to Study Access to Dental Care in the StateDelegate OaksIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0042 / CH0528State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Dentist and Dental Hygienist Members - Advice and Consent of the SenateSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0066 / CH0335Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - ExemptionSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0228
    (HB1283)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental PracticeSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0252 / CH0057
    (HB0511 / CH0058)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Finance
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0460
    (HB0680 / CH0111)
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local AnesthesiaSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0538
    (HB0830)
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed DentistsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0550
    (HB1608)
Task Force to Study Access to Dental Care in the StateSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0717
    (HB1339)
Environment - Radiation Machines - Registration FeesSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0720
    (HB0273)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Frederick Memorial Hospital Dental ClinicSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0791
    (HB0407)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental ClinicSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0806 / CH0700State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Establishment of Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and Naturopathic FormularySenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0825
    (HB0470 / CH0106)
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous OxideSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0919
    (HB1247 / CH0305)
Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health PlansSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0929
    (HB1318 / CH0309)
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network DirectoriesSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1082State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental PracticeSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1136 / CH0472Regulation of Radiation Sources - Fee - Exemption for Pro Bono Temporary Dental ClinicsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.